This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 03:07:32 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER HICKS VS BBB OPERATING CA-I, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 CHRISTOPHER HICKS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BBB OPERATING CA-I, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7962

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HICKS CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

BBB OPERATING CA-I LLC

WM SUNSET & VINE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

CONTI ROBERT W.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/29/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

5/13/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

4/12/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Sanctions Against Defendant's Former Counsel

3/7/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Sanctions Against Defendant's Former Counsel

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

3/1/2022: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

2/4/2022: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Answer - Answer

1/26/2022: Answer - Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/19/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

General Denial - General Denial

1/4/2022: General Denial - General Denial

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/5/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/5/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/5/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/5/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/5/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/5/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: BBB Operating CA-I, LLC (Defendant); WM Sunset & Vine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Christopher Hicks on 11/05/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Christopher Hicks as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: WM Sunset & Vine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 04/12/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Request for Sanctions Against Defendant's Former Counsel; Filed by: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: WM Sunset & Vine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 04/12/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: WM Sunset & Vine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: BBB Operating CA-I, LLC (Defendant); WM Sunset & Vine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: BBB Operating CA-I, LLC (Defendant); WM Sunset & Vine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: BBB Operating CA-I, LLC (Defendant); WM Sunset & Vine, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Christopher Hicks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WM SUNSET & VINE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONTI ROBERT W. ESQ.