This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2022 at 10:01:00 (UTC).

CHRISTINE ROBLES, ET AL. VS CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 CHRISTINE ROBLES, filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3851

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

ROBLES CHRISTINE

ROBLES OSCAR

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SIDHI CONSULTANTS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MERPOUR ARASH

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF ARASH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES PETITION TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFOR

11/17/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF ARASH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES PETITION TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFOR

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL ACTION

11/17/2022: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL ACTION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/16/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ERRATA TO DECLARATION OF ARASH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FIL

11/15/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ERRATA TO DECLARATION OF ARASH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FIL

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ERRATA TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION

11/15/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ERRATA TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/15/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ERRATA TO FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION

11/15/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF ERRATA TO FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION

Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF

11/9/2022: Memorandum (name extension) - Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES OF THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF

Petition (name extension) - Petition FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL ACTION

11/9/2022: Petition (name extension) - Petition FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL ACTION

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF ARASH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL A

11/9/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF ARASH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL A

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILI

11/4/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILI

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/3/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CELIA MOUTESLEE IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WAT

11/3/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CELIA MOUTESLEE IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WAT

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CELIA MOUTESLEE IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WAT

11/2/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CELIA MOUTESLEE IN OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WAT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/1/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application to shorten time to hear petition

11/3/2022: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application to shorten time to hear petition

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...)

11/3/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF ARSAH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES PETITION TO INSPECT THEIR WATE

11/3/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF ARSAH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES PETITION TO INSPECT THEIR WATE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Petition (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 01:30 PM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (name extension)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL ACTION: As To Parties changed from California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent), Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent) to California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent), Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketEx Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL ACTION; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDeclaration OF ARASH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES PETITION TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL ACTION; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/01/2022; Service Cost: 280.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice OF ERRATA TO DECLARATION OF ARASH MERPOUR IN SUPPORT OF THE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION OF CHRISTINE ROBLES AND OSCAR ROBLES TO INSPECT THEIR WATER LINE BEFORE FILING OF CIVIL ACTION; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketNotice OF ERRATA TO MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RE FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketPetition Christine Robles and Oscar Robles to Inspect Their Water Line Before Filing Civil Action; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Arash Merpour In support of the petition of Christine Robles and Oscar Robles to Inspect Their Water Line Before Filing of Civil Action; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities of the Petition of Christine Robles and Oscar Robles To Inspect Their Water Line Before Filing of Civil Action; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christine Robles (Petitioner); Oscar Robles (Petitioner); As to: California Automobile Insurance Company, a California Corporation (Respondent); Sidhi Consultants LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant