This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2022 at 02:58:24 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ VS WOKCANO VALENCIA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WOKCANO VALENCIA, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is UPINDER S. KALRA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4398

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

UPINDER S. KALRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ CHRISTIAN

Defendants

WOKCANO VALENCIA LLC

KWAN MARCUS K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

MILLER WADE A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/16/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference;)

6/15/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference;)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

4/13/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

Answer - Answer

3/16/2022: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

3/16/2022: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon - Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

3/16/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon - Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

3/16/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/16/2022

3/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 03/16/2022

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

3/16/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging Proposed Answer Wokcano Valencia

3/14/2022: Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging Proposed Answer Wokcano Valencia

Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging Proposed Answer Marcus K. Kwan

3/14/2022: Notice of Lodging (name extension) - Notice of Lodging Proposed Answer Marcus K. Kwan

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Lodgment of Court Reporter's Transcript

3/11/2022: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Lodgment of Court Reporter's Transcript

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

3/7/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

Reply (name extension) - Reply SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SET ASIDE

3/4/2022: Reply (name extension) - Reply SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SET ASIDE

Reply (name extension) - Reply Amended Reply

3/4/2022: Reply (name extension) - Reply Amended Reply

Reply (name extension) - Reply Amended Reply .doc version

3/4/2022: Reply (name extension) - Reply Amended Reply .doc version

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

2/7/2022: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

2/7/2022: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Christian Hernandez on 06/10/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Christian Hernandez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Wokcano Valencia, LLC (Defendant); Marcus K. Kwan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketAddress for Morse Mehrban (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 06/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 06/15/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 06/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 04/13/2022 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/15/2022 09:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Wokcano Valencia, LLC (Defendant); Marcus K. Kwan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Upinder S. Kalra in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Wokcano Valencia, LLC (Defendant); Marcus K. Kwan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Wokcano Valencia, LLC (Defendant); Marcus K. Kwan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less