This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2022 at 07:29:14 (UTC).

CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ VS RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2022 CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2400

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ CHRISTIAN

Defendant

RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/8/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

4/8/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint - Complaint

4/8/2022: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

4/8/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

4/8/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/8/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/15/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Christian Hernandez on 04/08/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Christian Hernandez as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAddress for Morse Mehrban (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Red Lobster Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Christian Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant