This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 22:34:13 (UTC).

CHAROB, LLC VS MARIO FELIX, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 CHAROB, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARIO FELIX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5309

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAROB LLC

Defendants

FELIX MARIO

RODRIGUEZ FABIAN D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/20/2021: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/20/2021: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/20/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/20/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/20/2021: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/4/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer - Answer

8/4/2021: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/3/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer - Answer

8/3/2021: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2024
  • Hearing07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: FABIAN D. RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: FABIAN D. RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: FABIAN D. RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: MARIO FELIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: MARIO FELIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: MARIO FELIX (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CHAROB, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO FELIX (Defendant); FABIAN D. RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CHAROB, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO FELIX (Defendant); FABIAN D. RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CHAROB, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MARIO FELIX (Defendant); FABIAN D. RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.