This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 10:27:20 (UTC).

CHARLOTTE AVERY INC. VS FABFAD INC.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 CHARLOTTE AVERY INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FABFAD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE F. BIRD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0142

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE F. BIRD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLOTTE AVERY INC.

Defendant

FABFAD INC.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

1/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/12/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (by Sheriff's)

2/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service (by Sheriff's)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/27/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Mike Chang

4/27/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) by Mike Chang

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer - Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Charlotte Avery Inc. (Plaintiff); FabFad Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service (by Sheriff's); Filed by: Charlotte Avery Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: FabFad Inc. (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/03/2021; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Charlotte Avery Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Charlotte Avery Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: FabFad Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. George F. Bird in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FABFAD INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant