This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 14:01:50 (UTC).

CHARLES POWELL VS CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 CHARLES POWELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY S. LESSER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY S. LESSER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWELL CHARLES

Defendant

CRYSTAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/10/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

1/10/2022: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

1/10/2022: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/1/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/10/2022: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/1/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

3/1/2022: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/1/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Charles Powell on 01/10/2022, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 664.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Crystal Property Management (Defendant) to Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Charles Powell (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Property Management (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 01/18/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Charles Powell (Plaintiff); As to: Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Charles Powell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Charles Powell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory S. Lesser in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Crystal Property Management (Defendant) to Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Crystal Property Management (Defendant) to Crystal Property Management (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less