This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 12:44:17 (UTC).

CHADNEY C DAVIS SORRELS, ET AL. VS QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 CHADNEY C DAVIS SORRELS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0186

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIS SORRELS CHADNEY C

POWELL-SORRELS LATOYA

Defendant

QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/19/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/19/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/19/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange

1/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange

Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR) - Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR)

4/8/2021: Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR) - Small Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (by sheriff's )

4/7/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (by sheriff's )

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Chadney C Davis Sorrels, et al. on 01/19/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Chadney C Davis Sorrels and LaToya Powell-Sorrels as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Request for Dismissal (ODR); Filed by: Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff); LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff); As to: Quiet Cannon Montebello INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (by sheriff's ); Filed by: Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff); LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff); As to: Quiet Cannon Montebello INC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 03/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff); LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court), Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff); LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol: As To Parties changed from Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff), LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff) to LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff), Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff); LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff); As to: Quiet Cannon Montebello INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Chadney C Davis Sorrels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: LaToya Powell-Sorrels (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUIET CANNON MONTEBELLO INC is a litigant