This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2022 at 20:57:40 (UTC).

CHAD HANNA VS RYAN FOLTZ

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 CHAD HANNA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RYAN FOLTZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7377

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANNA CHAD

Defendant

FOLTZ RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINA REZA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

11/3/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/3/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

11/3/2022: Complaint - Complaint

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

11/3/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

11/3/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2025
  • Hearing11/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2024
  • Hearing05/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Chad Hanna (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan Foltz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Chad Hanna (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan Foltz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Chad Hanna (Plaintiff); As to: Ryan Foltz (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINA REZA