This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2022 at 09:43:51 (UTC).

CERRITOS NISSAN VS JAVON CHAPEL POST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 CERRITOS NISSAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAVON CHAPEL POST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1532

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERRITOS NISSAN

Defendants

POST JAVON CHAPEL

MINER ARIKA

Not Classified By Court

MID VALLEY COLLECTON BUREAU

MID VALLEY COLLECTONS BUREAU A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

12/23/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

12/23/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/23/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/23/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/23/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/23/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/23/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/23/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment SASE

4/18/2022: Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment SASE

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection WRIT OF EXECUTION/MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

5/17/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection WRIT OF EXECUTION/MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

6/22/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/21/2022: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest: As To Parties changed from Arika Miner (Defendant), Javon Chapel Post (Defendant) to Javon Chapel Post (Defendant), Arika Miner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 720.00; Interest: 14.25; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- MID VALLEY COLLECTONS BUREAU, a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Assignee): Organization Name changed from MID VALLEY COLLECTON BUREAU to MID VALLEY COLLECTONS BUREAU, a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: MID VALLEY COLLECTONS BUREAU, a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Assignee); As to: Javon Chapel Post (Defendant); Arika Miner (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 14.25; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 05/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: MID VALLEY COLLECTON BUREAU (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection WRIT OF EXECUTION/MEMORANDUM OF COSTS: Name Extension: WRIT OF EXECUTION/MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; As To Parties changed from MID VALLEY COLLECTON BUREAU (Assignee) to MID VALLEY COLLECTON BUREAU (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment SASE; Filed by: MID VALLEY COLLECTON BUREAU (Assignee); As to: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Javon Chapel Post (Defendant) to Javon Chapel Post (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/23/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); As to: Arika Miner (Defendant); Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/23/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); As to: Javon Chapel Post (Defendant); Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/23/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); As to: Javon Chapel Post (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • Docket** Case Name changed from CERRITOS NISSAN vs JAVON CHAPEL POST to CERRITOS NISSAN vs JAVON CHAPEL POST, et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU is a litigant