This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2022 at 11:17:24 (UTC).

CERRITOS NISSAN VS HUMBERTO AVILA

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 CERRITOS NISSAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUMBERTO AVILA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1528

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERRITOS NISSAN

Defendant

AVILA HUMBERTO

Not Classified By Court

MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

12/23/2021: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

12/23/2021: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/23/2021: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/23/2022: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/23/2022: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/23/2022: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/23/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2022, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment SASE

4/18/2022: Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment SASE

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection WRIT OF EXECUTION/MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

5/17/2022: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection WRIT OF EXECUTION/MEMORANDUM OF COSTS

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

6/22/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

6/21/2022: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

8/8/2022: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

8/5/2022: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

8/3/2022: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest: As To Parties changed from Humberto Avila (Defendant) to Humberto Avila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): As To Parties: Humberto Avila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 565.00; Interest: 21.42; Costs: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): As To Parties: Humberto Avila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU, a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Assignee); As to: Humberto Avila (Defendant); Costs: 40.00; Interest: 21.42; Credits: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 08/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied); MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU, a CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Assignee); Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest: As To Parties changed from Humberto Avila (Defendant) to Humberto Avila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 525.00; Interest: 10.50; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/23/2022; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); As to: Humberto Avila (Defendant); Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/23/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Cerritos Nissan against Defendant Humberto Avila on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Cerritos Nissan on 12/23/2021 for the principal amount of $400.00 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $525.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Cerritos Nissan (Plaintiff); As to: Humberto Avila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID VALLEY COLLECTIONS BUREAU is a litigant