Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 07:27:00 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS VALERIE HARAGA, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VALERIE HARAGA, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9435

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

HARAGA AN INDIVIDUAL VALERIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAERO INGRID V.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

3/15/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • Hearing03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VALERIE HARAGA, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 03/19/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VALERIE HARAGA, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VALERIE HARAGA, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VALERIE HARAGA, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: VALERIE HARAGA, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAERO INGRID V.