Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 06:59:06 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS NICHOLAS E OTTO

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NICHOLAS E OTTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1863

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

OTTO NICHOLAS E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • Hearing04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nicholas E Otto (Defendant); Service Date: 04/03/2021; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nicholas E Otto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nicholas E Otto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Nicholas E Otto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON JOHN