This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 05:14:52 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS FELECITAS T MATEO, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FELECITAS T MATEO, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3609

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

MATEO AN INDIVIDUAL FELECITAS T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAERO INGRID V.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/20/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

9/20/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/20/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/20/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

10/8/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FELECITAS T MATEO, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 10/09/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FELECITAS T MATEO, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FELECITAS T MATEO, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FELECITAS T MATEO, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: FELECITAS T MATEO, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAERO INGRID V.