Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2021 at 07:58:55 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS APOLINAR TABARES, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against APOLINAR TABARES, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9718

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

TABARES APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAR RANJEET KAUR

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

3/26/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service

Complaint - Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

3/15/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • Hearing03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: APOLINAR TABARES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: APOLINAR TABARES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: APOLINAR TABARES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: APOLINAR TABARES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRAR RANJEET KAUR