Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2021 at 06:54:21 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS ALEX ZUROWSKI

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEX ZUROWSKI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDY RHODES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1845

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDY RHODES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

ZUROWSKI ALEX

Los Angeles, CA 90029-1051

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/24/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/29/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/29/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

4/1/2021: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC on 03/29/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alex Zurowski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alex Zurowski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alex Zurowski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alex Zurowski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON JOHN