This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 02:34:10 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. VS TANYA Y PRICE, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TANYA Y PRICE, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9735

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

PRICE AN INDIVIDUAL TANYA Y

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS RYAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

5/18/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/18/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

8/26/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/25/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies in Lieu of Originals

8/25/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies in Lieu of Originals

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

8/25/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/25/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033 CCP

8/25/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033 CCP

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

8/25/2021: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. against Defendant TANYA Y PRICE, an Individual on the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. on 05/18/2021 for damages of $6,533.36, attorney fees of $482.00, and costs of $357.00 for a total of $7,372.36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TANYA Y PRICE, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1788; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Copies in Lieu of Originals; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1033 CCP; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to TANYA Y PRICE, an Individual; On the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. on 05/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. on 05/18/2021, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A., does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TANYA Y PRICE, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 06/17/2021; Service Cost: 66.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TANYA Y PRICE, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TANYA Y PRICE, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TANYA Y PRICE, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: TANYA Y PRICE, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOS RYAN E. ESQ.