*******0902
01/13/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Debt Collection
Los Angeles, California
NICHOLAS F. DAUM
CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.
ALVAREZ ROBERTO I
Palmdale, CA 93551
ZARCO GLORIA
1/13/2023: Complaint - Complaint
1/13/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint
1/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
1/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
1/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)
1/18/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service
1/19/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Non-Service
Hearing01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO I ALVAREZ (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO I ALVAREZ (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERTO I ALVAREZ (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse
[-] Read Less