This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 21:10:37 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. VS KIMBERLY A DUGGAN

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIMBERLY A DUGGAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6817

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

DUGGAN KIMBERLY A

Burbank, CA 91505-1646

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORBES JAMIE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/15/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/15/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • Hearing10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kimberly A Duggan (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/01/2021; Service Cost: 77.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kimberly A Duggan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kimberly A Duggan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Kimberly A Duggan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORBES JAMIE