This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 23:08:40 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. VS ESTEBAN J FLORES, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ESTEBAN J FLORES, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0801

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

FLORES ESTEBAN J AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARSHALL AMY

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/24/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

5/24/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

5/24/2021: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/24/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

5/24/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

8/16/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies

8/6/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

8/6/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

8/6/2021: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

8/6/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/6/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/6/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. against Defendant ESTEBAN J FLORES an individual on the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. on 05/24/2021 for the principal amount of $2,690.71, attorney fees of $251.44, and costs of $247.00 for a total of $3,189.15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 08/16/2021 to 08/16/2021; Filed By: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/16/2021; As To Parties changed from ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant) to ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1033; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Copies; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1788; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual; On the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. on 05/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: ESTEBAN J FLORES, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARSHALL AMY