This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2023 at 00:23:45 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A. VS BETTY L PRAYTOR, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BETTY L PRAYTOR, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3294

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

PRAYTOR BETTY L AN INDIVIDUAL

La Puente, CA 91744

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS RYAN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/13/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/13/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

6/13/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Venue

Complaint - Complaint

6/13/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/13/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/13/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

6/13/2022: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/24/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/2/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies

9/2/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Copies

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

9/2/2022: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

9/2/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/2/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

9/2/2022: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1788

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

9/15/2022: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. against Defendant BETTY L PRAYTOR an individual on the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. on 06/13/2022 for the principal amount of $3,796.58, attorney fees of $317.79, and costs of $248.50 for a total of $4,362.87.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BETTY L PRAYTOR, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. on 06/13/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A., does 1-10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BETTY L PRAYTOR, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1788; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1033; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Copies; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BETTY L PRAYTOR, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BETTY L PRAYTOR, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BETTY L PRAYTOR, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BETTY L PRAYTOR, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cavalry SPV I, LLC, as assignee of Citibank, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: BETTY L PRAYTOR, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOS RYAN E. ESQ.