This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2022 at 09:47:50 (UTC).

CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MANUEL MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 CASHCALL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANUEL MENDOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3076

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

MENDOZA MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORAN TREVOR G.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/19/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/4/2022: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

11/7/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION on 10/19/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL MENDOZA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL MENDOZA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketAddress for TREVOR G. MORAN (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL MENDOZA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL MENDOZA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- TREVOR G. MORAN (Attorney): Organization Name: MULVANEY BARRY BEATTY LINN & MAYERS LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less