This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2023 at 21:11:13 (UTC).

CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JANICE ALVARADO, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 CASHCALL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JANICE ALVARADO, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT R. HERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4925

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT R. HERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASHCALL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ALVARADO JANICE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORAN TREVOR G.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

10/19/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/19/2022: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/19/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/6/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JANICE ALVARADO, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to JANICE ALVARADO, an individual; On the Complaint filed by CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION on 10/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JANICE ALVARADO, an individual (Defendant); Service Date: 10/26/2022; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JANICE ALVARADO, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JANICE ALVARADO, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CASHCALL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JANICE ALVARADO, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Scott R. Herin in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASHCALL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor G Moran