This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2023 at 09:03:30 (UTC).

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS MANUEL ALCAZAR, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/27/2023 FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANUEL ALCAZAR, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8468

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

ALCAZAR AN INDIVIDUAL MANUEL DBA MANNY ROOTER SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAR ANGIE HONG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/27/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/27/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) Order to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/27/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) Order to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

10/02/2024

Hearing10/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL ALCAZAR, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL ALCAZAR, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MANUEL ALCAZAR, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less