This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2023 at 08:32:46 (UTC).

TIFFANY E. TOWNS VS GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 TIFFANY E TOWNS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOLDMAN SACHS CO LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EMMA CASTRO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4529

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

EMMA CASTRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOWNS TIFFANY E.

Defendants

GOLDMAN SACHS & CO. LLC

TRANS UNION LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

9/15/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

9/15/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/15/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/15/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

9/19/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriffs Department

9/28/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriffs Department

Request for Dismissal

10/24/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/27/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

10/27/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Tiffany E. Towns (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Tiffany E. Towns on 09/15/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Tiffany E. Towns as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 10/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Tiffany E. Towns (Plaintiff); As to: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Tiffany E. Towns on 09/15/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Tiffany E. Towns as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Tiffany E. Towns (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 10/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) By Sheriffs Department; Filed by: Tiffany E. Towns (Plaintiff); As to: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 09/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tiffany E. Towns (Plaintiff); As to: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (Defendant); Trans Union LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (Defendant), Trans Union LLC (Defendant) to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (Defendant), Trans Union LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Tiffany E. Towns (Plaintiff); As to: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (Defendant); Trans Union LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Tiffany E. Towns (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Emma Castro in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

[+] Read More [-] Read Less