This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2023 at 01:10:03 (UTC).

RAYMOND ANTHONY WRIGHT VS THE SUMMIT, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 RAYMOND ANTHONY WRIGHT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE SUMMIT, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2525

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT RAYMOND ANTHONY

Defendant

THE SUMMIT LLC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/16/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/16/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/16/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/29/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/29/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/29/2023

9/29/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/29/2023

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2023

8/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/16/2023

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

8/16/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/16/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/5/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/5/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/05/2023

7/5/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/05/2023

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/5/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

6/5/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/25/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/24/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/24/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2023

DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Raymond Anthony Wright on 05/24/2023 as follows: Plaintiff to take nothing by virtue of the complaint.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Summit, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 11/16/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Raymond Anthony Wright (Plaintiff); As to: The Summit, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 0.00; Proof of Mailing Date: 05/30/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Summit, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/29/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
07/05/2023

DocketThere being no judge available this date, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/16/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: The Summit, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Raymond Anthony Wright (Plaintiff); As to: The Summit, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/30/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Raymond Anthony Wright (Plaintiff); As to: The Summit, LLC (Defendant); Mailing Date: 05/30/2023; Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Raymond Anthony Wright (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Raymond Anthony Wright (Plaintiff); As to: The Summit, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/24/2023

DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less