This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2023 at 17:02:58 (UTC).

ALL IN CREDIT UNION VS BRYAN HILU-BATRES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 ALL IN CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BRYAN HILU-BATRES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6073

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL IN CREDIT UNION

Defendants

HILU-BATRES BRYAN

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. AS NOMINEE FOR PERFORMANCE FINANCIAL INC DBA PACIFIC FUNING MORTGAGE DIVISION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANAYA ALANA B

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/19/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Complaint

9/19/2023: Complaint

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/19/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests

9/19/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

9/19/2023: Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Answer

10/27/2023: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/30/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing

11/15/2023: Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing

 

Docket Entries

09/22/2026

Hearing09/22/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2025

Hearing03/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketUpdated -- Answer: Filed By: BRYAN HILU-BATRES (Defendant); Result: Voided ; Result Date: 11/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketClerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): Status Date changed from 10/27/2023 to 10/30/2023 ; Status changed from TP to Signed and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: BRYAN HILU-BATRES (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketUpdated -- Answer: As To Parties: ALL IN CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); TP by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/18/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/22/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: ALL IN CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: BRYAN HILU-BATRES (Defendant); MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., AS NOMINEE FOR PERFORMANCE FINANCIAL INC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ALL IN CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: BRYAN HILU-BATRES (Defendant); MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., AS NOMINEE FOR PERFORMANCE FINANCIAL INC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALL IN CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: BRYAN HILU-BATRES (Defendant); MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC., AS NOMINEE FOR PERFORMANCE FINANCIAL INC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less