This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2023 at 11:14:59 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. VS LYDIA K ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LYDIA K ROBINSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4085

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE N.A.

Defendant

ROBINSON LYDIA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APOSHIAN GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/12/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/12/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status

5/12/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/12/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/17/2023: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/17/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

7/17/2023: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033 - Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/17/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration nonmilitary status

7/17/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration nonmilitary status

Judgment - Judgment

7/21/2023: Judgment - Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff CAPITAL ONE, N.A. against Defendant LYDIA K ROBINSON on the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE, N.A. on 05/12/2023 for the principal amount of $3,133.87 and costs of $363.00 for a total of $3,496.87.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration nonmilitary status; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to LYDIA K ROBINSON; On the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE, N.A. on 05/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CAPITAL ONE, N.A. on 05/12/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by CAPITAL ONE, N.A., does 1-5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status: Document changed from Supplemental Declaration (name extension) to Declaration (name extension) ; As To Parties changed from LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant) to LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Nonmilitary Status; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: LYDIA K ROBINSON (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less