This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2023 at 11:18:24 (UTC).

PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC VS SOTIROS PISANIS

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SOTIROS PISANIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3247

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PCA ACQUISITIONS V LLC

Defendant

PISANIS SOTIROS AKA SOTIROS S PISANIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ORTEGA EILEEN

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS LYNDA E.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue

5/17/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Venue

Complaint - Complaint

5/17/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

5/17/2023: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/17/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/17/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

6/14/2023: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

6/14/2023: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

6/14/2023: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2024
  • Hearing05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Sotiros Pisanis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Sotiros Pisanis (Defendant); As to: Pca Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Pca Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sotiros Pisanis (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/23/2023; Service Cost: 141.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pca Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sotiros Pisanis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pca Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sotiros Pisanis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pca Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sotiros Pisanis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Pca Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sotiros Pisanis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Venue; Filed by: Pca Acquisitions V, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Sotiros Pisanis (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less