This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 14:04:54 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK VS HELEN PEREZ

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC , ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HELEN PEREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4161

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

PEREZ HELEN AKA HELEN E PEREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHLICK ALISON K

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

5/30/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/30/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/30/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2024
  • Hearing06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HELEN PEREZ (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 89.00; Proof of Mailing Date: 06/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HELEN PEREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HELEN PEREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC., ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HELEN PEREZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less