This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2023 at 12:46:47 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY VS ENTERPRISES RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/27/2023 OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ENTERPRISES RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6214

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ENTERPRISES RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/27/2023: Complaint

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/27/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/27/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

9/27/2023: Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests

9/27/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/27/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service

10/30/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

11/8/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

11/08/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY on 09/27/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ENTERPRISES RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketAddress for Todd F. Haines (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ENTERPRISES RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 79.00; Service Date: 10/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ENTERPRISES RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ENTERPRISES RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: ENTERPRISES RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, A CORPORATION (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/30/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less