This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2023 at 08:20:14 (UTC).

GALPIN MOTORS, INC VS ANOUSONE KHAMNUENGTHAI

Case Summary

On 08/23/2023 GALPIN MOTORS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANOUSONE KHAMNUENGTHAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN A. R. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0966

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN A. R. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALPIN MOTORS INC

Defendant

KHAMNUENGTHAI ANOUSONE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

8/23/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/23/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/23/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/27/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/12/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/12/2023

10/12/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/12/2023

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/13/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/12/2023: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2023

DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Galpin Motors, Inc against Defendant Anousone Khamnuengthai on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Galpin Motors, Inc on 08/23/2023 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $165.00 for a total of $2,665.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 10/12/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Galpin Motors, Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/12/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Galpin Motors, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Anousone Khamnuengthai (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/11/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Galpin Motors, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Anousone Khamnuengthai (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lauren A. R. Lofton in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less