This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2023 at 19:10:28 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., VS WALTER RIVERA

Case Summary

On 05/01/2023 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC , filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WALTER RIVERA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2889

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

RIVERA WALTER AKA WALTER M RIVERA AKA WALTER MARTINEZ RIVERA AKA WALTER LOPEZ RIVERA AKA WALTER RIVERA LOPEZ DBA WALTER M RIVERA PLUMBING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JYOO JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/26/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Judgment - Default Judgment

8/28/2023: Judgment - Default Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Default Judgment

8/28/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/17/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

8/17/2023: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/17/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF JOSEPH JYOO RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND CALCULATION OF INTEREST

8/17/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF JOSEPH JYOO RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND CALCULATION OF INTEREST

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/7/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/26/2023

5/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/26/2023

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/26/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/1/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/1/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

5/1/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/1/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/1/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., against Defendant WALTER RIVERA AKA WALTER LOPEZ RIVERA, AKA WALTER M RIVERA, AKA WALTER MARTINEZ RIVERA, AKA WALTER RIVERA LOPEZ, DBA WALTER M RIVERA PLUMBING on the Complaint filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., on 05/01/2023 for damages of $7,139.65, interest of $663.32, and costs of $324.76 for a total of $8,127.73.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: WALTER RIVERA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: As To Parties changed from WALTER RIVERA (Defendant) to WALTER RIVERA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Default Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration DECLARATION OF JOSEPH JYOO RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND CALCULATION OF INTEREST; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: WALTER RIVERA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: WALTER RIVERA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: WALTER RIVERA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: WALTER RIVERA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less