This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2023 at 14:04:20 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS TOMAS J ALVAREZ JR, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOMAS J ALVAREZ JR, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4679

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

ALVAREZ JR TOMAS J AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILLBERG JOSLYN N

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

5/19/2023: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Regarding Statement of Venue

5/19/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Regarding Statement of Venue

Complaint - Complaint

5/19/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/19/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/19/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/1/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2024
  • Hearing05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOMAS J ALVAREZ Jr, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/01/2023; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOMAS J ALVAREZ Jr, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOMAS J ALVAREZ Jr, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Statement of Venue; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOMAS J ALVAREZ Jr, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOMAS J ALVAREZ Jr, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: TOMAS J ALVAREZ Jr, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less