This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2023 at 08:07:04 (UTC).

FARANGIZ USMONOVA, ET AL. VS VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2023 FARANGIZ USMONOVA, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS J. GRIEGO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4095

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS J. GRIEGO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

USMONOVA FARANGIZ

KULIEV ALI

Defendant

VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

8/21/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

8/21/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/21/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/25/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/2/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/2/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

10/02/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 10/02/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Farangiz Usmonova and Plaintiff Ali Kuliev against Defendant Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Farangiz Usmonova, et al. on 08/21/2023 for the principal amount of $3,000.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $3,090.00, joint and several.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Farangiz Usmonova (Plaintiff); As to: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 425.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Farangiz Usmonova (Plaintiff); Ali Kuliev (Plaintiff); As to: Verizon Wireless Services, LLC. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas J. Griego in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less