This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 03:09:18 (UTC).

KATHRYN TREACY COLBERT, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 KATHRYN TREACY COLBERT, filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AMY YERKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0523

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

AMY YERKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLBERT KATHRYN TREACY

DINGMAN DAVID JAY

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/11/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/11/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

5/11/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2023
  • Hearing06/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S13 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Southern California Edison Company (Defendant) to Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kathryn Treacy Colbert (Plaintiff); David Jay Dingman (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Amy Yerkey in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Kathryn Treacy Colbert (Plaintiff); David Jay Dingman (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less