This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2023 at 09:17:36 (UTC).

HYUN MO PARK VS VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICE LLC

Case Summary

On 07/12/2023 HYUN MO PARK filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICE LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4382

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK HYUN MO

Defendant

VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICE LLC

 

Court Documents

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

7/12/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/12/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/12/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

7/12/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/12/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/12/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/27/2023: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

07/27/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Hyun Mo Park on 07/12/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Hyun Mo Park as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Hyun Mo Park (Plaintiff); As to: Verizon Wireless Service LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/15/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hyun Mo Park (Plaintiff); As to: Verizon Wireless Service LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/15/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Hyun Mo Park (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hyun Mo Park (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less