This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2023 at 01:03:04 (UTC).

GUY R. BAYLEY VS VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2023 GUY R BAYLEY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BEVERLY BOURNE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1629

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BEVERLY BOURNE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYLEY GUY R.

Defendant

VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

7/21/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

7/21/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/21/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/1/2023: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2023

9/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2023

 

Docket Entries

09/01/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by GUY R. BAYLEY on 07/21/2023, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 09/01/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: GUY R. BAYLEY (Plaintiff); As to: VERIZON WIRELESS SERVICES LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Beverly Bourne in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less