This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2023 at 18:25:16 (UTC).

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY DIRECT INSURANCE VS SAINTS OFFROAD, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/09/2023 BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY DIRECT INSURANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SAINTS OFFROAD, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3055

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY DIRECT INSURANCE

Defendant

SAINTS OFFROAD A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

5/9/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/9/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/9/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/9/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

5/9/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

5/9/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/9/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/15/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2026
  • Hearing05/12/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2024
  • Hearing11/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance (Plaintiff); As to: Saints Offroad, a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/01/2023; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/12/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance (Plaintiff); As to: Saints Offroad, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance (Plaintiff); As to: Saints Offroad, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Berkshire Hathaway Direct Insurance (Plaintiff); As to: Saints Offroad, a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less