This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2023 at 15:24:47 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS JOSE RAMIREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE RAMIREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA GARCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4164

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA GARCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

RAMIREZ AN INDIVIDUAL JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACK TIFFANY A.

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/13/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Venue

9/13/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Venue

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) Order to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) Order to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

9/13/2023: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Proof of Personal Service

10/2/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2024

Hearing09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE RAMIREZ, an Individual (Defendant); Service Date: 09/30/2023; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE RAMIREZ, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Garcia in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE RAMIREZ, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE RAMIREZ, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE RAMIREZ, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketDeclaration Declaration of Venue; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE RAMIREZ, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less