This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2023 at 08:11:26 (UTC).

FIRST CREDIT UNION VS SCOTT ALAN CAMPBELL

Case Summary

On 08/10/2023 FIRST CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCOTT ALAN CAMPBELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NICHOLAS F. DAUM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1215

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

NICHOLAS F. DAUM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST CREDIT UNION

Defendant

CAMPBELL SCOTT ALAN AKA SCOTT CAMPBELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNS BARRY

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/10/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

8/10/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

8/10/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

8/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

08/15/2024

Hearing08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Scott Alan Campbell (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 80.00; Service Date: 08/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Scott Alan Campbell (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Scott Alan Campbell (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Scott Alan Campbell (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Case Management Review (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Nicholas F. Daum in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less