This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2023 at 20:22:58 (UTC).

THE BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY VS KEVIN TRUCKING LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/08/2023 THE BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KEVIN TRUCKING LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5764

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE BURLINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

KEVIN TRUCKING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/8/2023: Complaint

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/8/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/8/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests

9/8/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

9/8/2023: Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

9/8/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/2/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summary of the Case

11/2/2023: Summary of the Case

Request for Dismissal

11/2/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/2/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

11/2/2023: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

 

Docket Entries

09/11/2026

Hearing09/11/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2025

Hearing03/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: The Burlington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Trucking LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketSummary of the Case; Filed by: The Burlington Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: The Burlington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Trucking LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: The Burlington Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketDefault entered as to Kevin Trucking LLC, a limited liability company; On the Complaint filed by The Burlington Insurance Company on 09/08/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by The Burlington Insurance Company on 09/08/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by The Burlington Insurance Company, does 1-100

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: The Burlington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Trucking LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 99.00; Proof of Mailing Date: 09/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: The Burlington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Trucking LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: The Burlington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Trucking LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: The Burlington Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Trucking LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/11/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less