This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2023 at 15:01:24 (UTC).

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY VS PR BUILDERS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2023 GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PR BUILDERS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4309

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY

Defendants

PR BUILDERS INC.

PERALES JOSE LUIS

KILKEA LA LLC

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILER NORMAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

7/7/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/7/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

7/7/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/7/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests

7/7/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests

Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

7/7/2023: Third Amended Standing Order Third Amended Standing Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/5/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/5/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/17/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2026

Hearing07/10/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2025

Hearing01/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Kilkea LA, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketDefault entered as to Kilkea LA, LLC; On the Complaint filed by Ganahl Lumber Company on 07/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: PR Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 87.50; Proof of Mailing Date: 09/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Kilkea LA, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 139.00; Service Date: 09/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Suretec Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 41.50; Service Date: 09/12/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Luis Perales (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 101.26; Proof of Mailing Date: 09/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/10/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: PR Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Jose Luis Perales (Defendant); Kilkea LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: PR Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Jose Luis Perales (Defendant); Kilkea LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: PR Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Jose Luis Perales (Defendant); Kilkea LA, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less