*******3340
05/22/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Los Angeles, California
MARK E. WINDHAM
RADULESCU CRISTIAN DBA CRI TRUCKING
SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CORPORATION
HAINES TODD F.
KHARARJIAN AZNIV
5/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet
5/22/2023: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order
5/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
5/22/2023: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter
5/22/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint
5/22/2023: Complaint - Complaint
5/22/2023: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests
7/7/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
7/25/2023: Answer - Answer
Hearing05/26/2026 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service
[-] Read LessHearing11/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer; Filed by: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); As to: CRISTIAN RADULESCU (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CRISTIAN RADULESCU (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/27/2023; Service Cost: 80.98; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark E. Windham in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/26/2026 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: CRISTIAN RADULESCU (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CRISTIAN RADULESCU (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CRISTIAN RADULESCU (Plaintiff); As to: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read Less