This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2023 at 15:24:07 (UTC).

LOGIX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS CHRISTOPHER C BRAUN

Case Summary

On 04/19/2023 LOGIX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER C BRAUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0245

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOGIX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION FKA LOCKHEED FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

BRAUN CHRISTOPHER C AKA CHRISTOPHER COLLIER BRAUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOEL SHERYL D.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sheryl D Noel re Venue

4/19/2023: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Sheryl D Noel re Venue

Complaint - Complaint

4/19/2023: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/19/2023: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/19/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2024
  • Hearing04/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: LOGIX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER C BRAUN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Sheryl D Noel re Venue; Filed by: LOGIX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER C BRAUN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: LOGIX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER C BRAUN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: LOGIX FEDERAL CREDIT UNION (Plaintiff); As to: CHRISTOPHER C BRAUN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less