This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2023 at 18:00:15 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC VS LORRAINA D LOMELI, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LORRAINA D LOMELI, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4688

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

LOMELI LORRAINA D AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PACK TIFFANY A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/19/2023: Complaint

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/19/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

5/19/2023: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Venue

5/19/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Venue

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/19/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Non-Service

6/12/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Non-Service

7/3/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

05/24/2024

Hearing05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department Y at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDeclaration of Non-Service; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LORRAINA D LOMELI, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department Y Norwalk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketDeclaration of Venue; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LORRAINA D LOMELI, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LORRAINA D LOMELI, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LORRAINA D LOMELI, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: LORRAINA D LOMELI, an Individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less