This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2023 at 14:58:19 (UTC).

GALPIN MOTORS, INC VS KENNETH DAVITIAN

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 GALPIN MOTORS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KENNETH DAVITIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAUREN A. R. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0516

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAUREN A. R. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALPIN MOTORS INC

Defendant

DAVITIAN KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

5/11/2023: Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

5/11/2023: Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims - Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5/11/2023: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/5/2023: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • Hearing06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F44 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff); As to: KENNETH DAVITIAN (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: GALPIN MOTORS, INC (Plaintiff); As to: KENNETH DAVITIAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Program - Small Claims; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lauren A. R. Lofton in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less