This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2023 at 12:09:15 (UTC).

CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN, ET AL. VS JELSAROSE CAVALLI

Case Summary

On 10/04/2022 CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JELSAROSE CAVALLI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KATHERINE CHILTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6561

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KATHERINE CHILTON

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Plaintiffs

TAN CARLITO MARTINEZ

TAN BELEN MANALO

CAVALLI JELSAROSE

Not Classified By Court and Defendant

CAVALLI JELSAROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE ANGELA S.

Defendant Attorney

CASTRONOVO TOD MICHAEL

Other Attorneys

WILLIAMS CLAIRE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

10/4/2022: Third Amended Standing Order - Third Amended Standing Order

General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

10/4/2022: General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interp - General Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Inter

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/4/2022: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

10/4/2022: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

10/4/2022: Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests - Notice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/7/2022: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/29/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

12/29/2022: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

12/29/2022: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/21/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

4/21/2023: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - Answer to Cross-Complaint

4/21/2023: Answer - Answer to Cross-Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2025
  • Hearing10/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2024
  • Hearing04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint; Filed by: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Cross-Defendant); As to: Jelsarose Covelli Erroneously Sued As JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNotice OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Cross-Defendant); As to: Jelsarose Covelli Erroneously Sued As JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Defendant); As to: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Plaintiff); BELEN MANALO TAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Jelsarose Covelli Erroneously Sued As JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Defendant); As to: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Plaintiff); BELEN MANALO TAN (Plaintiff); As to: JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Katherine Chilton in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/07/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Plaintiff); BELEN MANALO TAN (Plaintiff); As to: JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Plaintiff); BELEN MANALO TAN (Plaintiff); As to: JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CARLITO MARTINEZ TAN (Plaintiff); BELEN MANALO TAN (Plaintiff); As to: JELSAROSE CAVALLI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketGeneral Order RE Limited Jurisdiction Civil Procedure: Notice of Web Portal Availability for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Limited Civil Jurisdiction Web Portal for Interpreter Requests; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less