This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 12:20:24 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. VS ROSA BARRERAS

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROSA BARRERAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0844

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

BARRERAS ROSA

Palmdale, CA 93551

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALZER CARR ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/13/2023: Complaint

Summons Summons on Complaint

1/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/17/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment

3/17/2023: Default Judgment

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

3/17/2023: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rosa Barreras (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rosa Barreras (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rosa Barreras (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to Rosa Barreras; On the Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. on 01/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. against Defendant Rosa Barreras on the Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. on 01/13/2023 for the principal amount of $5,080.94 and costs of $293.50 for a total of $5,374.44.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rosa Barreras (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/23/2023; Service Cost: 68.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rosa Barreras (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rosa Barreras (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: Rosa Barreras (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less