Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 18:22:14 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. VS CECILIA M MCLURE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CECILIA M MCLURE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5829

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA ANDREA DAVALOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A.

Defendant

MCLURE CECILIA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BUIZA KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

5/5/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims - Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

4/29/2021: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees - Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

4/30/2021: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

2/18/2021: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/18/2021: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

2/18/2021: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CECILIA M MCLURE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. against Defendant CECILIA M MCLURE on the Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. on 02/18/2021 for the principal amount of $5,724.17 and costs of $292.00 for a total of $6,016.17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CECILIA M MCLURE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to CECILIA M MCLURE; On the Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. on 02/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CECILIA M MCLURE (Defendant); Service Date: 03/04/2021; Service Cost: 67.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria Andrea Davalos in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CECILIA M MCLURE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CECILIA M MCLURE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: CECILIA M MCLURE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUIZA KEVIN